This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:02:51 (UTC).

Sutherland v. Caliber Home Loans Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Sutherland filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nita L. Stormes and Janis L. Sammartino. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02152

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nita L. Stormes

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isabella Sutherland

Defendants

Does 1-25

Caliber Home Loans Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine M. Adams

Attorney at Adams Law

510 State Street, Suite 265

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Defendant Attorneys

Jill Louise Ripke

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Jonesh G. Daryanani

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proof of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/11/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/12/2019.(jpp) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 #1

Proposed Order

7 #2

Proof of Service

1 #2

State Court Complaint

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Louise Ripke on behalf of Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ripke, Jill)Attorney Jill Louise Ripke added to party Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #4

Declaration of Jill Ripke

1 #5

Proof of Service

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

5 #1

Proof of Service

1 #3

Declaration of Alyson Rochelle

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and Related Dates by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Daryanani, Jonesh) (jpp). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ECF No. #7 ). Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/7/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/15/2019. (jrm) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Court of Removal to Federal Court by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Daryanani, Jonesh) (jpp). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and Related Dates by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Daryanani, Jonesh) (jpp). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/11/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/12/2019.(jpp) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Louise Ripke on behalf of Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ripke, Jill)Attorney Jill Louise Ripke added to party Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00053251-CU-WT-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13146120.), filed by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration of Alyson Rochelle, #4 Declaration of Jill Ripke, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02152-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.