This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:09:28 (UTC).

Suter et al v. Citizens Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Suter filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citizens Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01529

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yoonjoung S. Suter

Christopher A. Suter

Defendants

Citizens Bank, National Association

Citizens Bank, National Association doing business as Citizens One Auto Finance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Z Savran

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Ste. 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Charles F Webber

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Ste. 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Citizens Bank, National Association. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) Citizens Bank's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Citizens Bank, National Association. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Citizens Bank, National Association answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/31/2020.(TJB) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Webber, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Citizens Bank, National Association. Jointly Signed by Christopher A. Suter and Yoonjoung S. Suter. (Webber, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher A. Suter, Yoonjoung S. Suter. Citizens Bank, National Association served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, National Association, d/b/a Citizens One Auto Finance. (lmb) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, National Association (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7859372) filed by Christopher A. Suter, Yoonjoung S. Suter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Citizens Bank, National Association. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Citizens Bank's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Citizens Bank, National Association. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Citizens Bank, National Association answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/31/2020.(TJB) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Webber, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Citizens Bank, National Association. Jointly Signed by Christopher A. Suter and Yoonjoung S. Suter. (Webber, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher A. Suter, Yoonjoung S. Suter. Citizens Bank, National Association served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, National Association, d/b/a Citizens One Auto Finance. (lmb) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1529 (DWF/DTS). (lmb) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, National Association (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7859372) filed by Christopher A. Suter, Yoonjoung S. Suter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less