This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:47 (UTC).

Sustainable Modular Management Inc v. The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Sustainable Modular Management Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01883

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sustainable Modular Management Inc

Defendant

The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S Alfred

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Tracy J Carson

Attorney at Hallett & Perrin PC

1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Marcie L Schout

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Wm Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sustainable Modular Management Inc. (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 8/16/2021. Status Report due by 8/16/2021. Motions due by 9/13/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint) by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/19/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/22/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies Inc for The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Schout, Marcie) Modified Corporate Parent on 7/16/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11001679.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) Modified filing information on 7/16/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sustainable Modular Management Inc. (Alfred, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 8/16/2021. Status Report due by 8/16/2021. Motions due by 9/13/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint) by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/19/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/22/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies Inc for The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Schout, Marcie) Modified Corporate Parent on 7/16/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by The Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11001679.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) Modified filing information on 7/16/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less