This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:31:02 (UTC).

Sussman Sales Company, Inc. v. VWR International, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Sussman Sales Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VWR International, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02869

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sussman Sales Company, Inc.

Defendant

VWR International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Max Folkenflik

Attorney at Folkenflik & McGerity

1500 Broadway, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Kan Min Nawaday

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Michael Matthew Agosta

Attorney at Venable LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#4

#3

2 #5

Ex. E - VWR April 18, 2019 VWR Letter to Sussman

2 #4

Ex. C. - Sussman Education April 3, 2019 Termination Letter

2 #3

Ex. C. - Sussman Education April 3, 2019 Termination Letter

2 #2

Ex. B - Feb. 1, 2019 Letter Susman to VWR

2 #1

Ex. A - VWR-Sussman Sales Rep. Agr., Oct. 4, 2018

#2

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/26/2020. Responses due by 7/24/2020 Replies due by 8/7/2020. (rro) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER terminating #14 Letter Motion for Conference. On May 19, 2020, Defendant filed a letter with the Court seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #14). Plaintiff filed a responsive letter on May 22, 2020 (Dkt. #15), and Defendant filed a reply letter on May 24, 2020 (Dkt. #16). Having carefully reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court believes that a pre-motion conference is not necessary and instead sets the following briefing schedule for Defendant's motion: Defendant's opening papers will be due on or before June 26, 2020; Plaintiff's opposing papers will be due on or before July 24, 2020; and Defendant's reply will be due on or before August 7, 2020. The Court ORDERS that Defendant's time to file a responsive pleading and all discovery is STAYED pending resolution of the motion. Finally, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 24, 2020, is ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated May 24, 2020 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated May 19, 2020. . Document filed by VWR International, LLC..(Nawaday, Kan) (Entered: 05/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Max Folkenflik dated 5/22/2020 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated May 19, 2020. . Document filed by Sussman Sales Company, Inc...(Folkenflik, Max) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated May 19, 2020. Document filed by VWR International, LLC..(Nawaday, Kan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #12 denying #11 Letter Motion for Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter requesting that the Court compel Defendant to take part in a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference by June 12, 2016 (Dkt. #11), and Defendant's response (Dkt. #12). Based on the record before it, the Court sees no basis at this time to compel Defendant to participate in a Rule 26(f) conference by a prescribed date. Application DENIED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/23/2020) (rro) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated April 23, 2020 re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request June 12 date for Rule 26(f) Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Max Folkenflik dated 4.22.2020. . Document filed by VWR International, LLC..(Nawaday, Kan) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER MOTION for Conference Request June 12 date for Rule 26(f) Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Max Folkenflik dated 4.22.2020. Document filed by Sussman Sales Company, Inc...(Folkenflik, Max) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Application GRANTED. Defendant has until May 29, 2020, to answer, move, or otherwise response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (VWR International, LLC answer due 5/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/21/2020) (rro) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kan M. Nawaday dated April 21, 2020. Document filed by VWR International, LLC..(Nawaday, Kan) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to VWR International, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/9/2020) (rro) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VWR International, LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Sussman Sales Company, Inc...(Folkenflik, Max) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Max Folkenflik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $44000000000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-19363005, paid on 4/7/2020..(jgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against VWR International, LLC. Document filed by Sussman Sales Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - VWR-Sussman Sales Rep. Agr., Oct. 4, 2018, #2 Ex. B - Feb. 1, 2019 Letter Susman to VWR, #3 Ex. C. - Sussman Education April 3, 2019 Termination Letter, #4 Ex. C. - Sussman Education April 3, 2019 Termination Letter, #5 Ex. E - VWR April 18, 2019 VWR Letter to Sussman).(Folkenflik, Max) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Folkenflik, Max) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VWR International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kan Min Nawaday