This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 08:30:28 (UTC).

Sussman et al v. San Diego Police Dept. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Sussman filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against San Diego Police Dept. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda Lopez and Cathy Ann Bencivengo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01085

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda Lopez

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Sussman

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendants

CHP Office Parra

Board of Registered Nursing

Officer Jordan

DMV Director Gordon

Brent

Discrimination, Violation of Due Process, False Arrest

SDPD Chief David Nieslt

San Diego Police Dept.

Joel Johnson

Dr Prakish Bhabia M.D.

Officer Tharp

Nicole Mondecelo

Alfonso Martinez

Officers 1-400

California Highway Patrol Dept of Motor Vehicles

Anders Holthaus

Detective Curtis

Offiers Pickard

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas E Baxter

Attorney at State of California, Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Steven Ray Guess

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney - City of San Diego

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Ryan Souther

Attorney at Neil Dymott Frank McCabe & Hudson APLC

110 West A Street #1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Phillip Edmond Stephan

Attorney at Neil Dymott Frank McCabe & Hudson

110 West A Street, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Gregory P Konoske

Attorney at Konoske Akiyama & Brust LLP

16880 West Bernardo Drive, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92127-1615

Other Attorneys

Peter H. Klee

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-3372

Matthew L Green

Attorney at Best Best and Krieger LLP

655 West Broadway, 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Andrea Warren

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Robert A Ortiz

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Hwy Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas C. Swann

Attorney at Giovanniello Law Group

1 Pointe Drive, Suite 300

Brea, CA 92821

 

Court Documents

62 #3

Proof of Service

62 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

62 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#62

#61

60 #3

Proof of Service Certificate of Service

60 #2

Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants

60 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants A

#60

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint by Wendy Patrick, Summer Stephen in her Role as District Attorney and Individually. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Ortiz, Robert)Attorney Robert A Ortiz added to party Wendy Patrick(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Ortiz added to party Summer Stephen in her Role as District Attorney and Individually(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by CHP Office Parra. (Baxter, Douglas) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alfonso Martinez, Esperanza Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Alfonso Martinez and Esperanza Martinezs Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Concurrent Anti-SLAPP Motion Pursuant to CCP 425.16 to Dismiss State Law Claims, or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Alfonso Martinez and Esperanza Martinezs Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Concurrent Anti-SLAPP Motion Pursuant to CCP 425.16 to Dismiss State Law Claims, or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Konoske, Gregory) (anh). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss [Doc. Nos. #55 , #56 #57 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/11/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AllState Insurance Company. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Warren, Andrea) (anh). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (on Plaintiffs' Fifth and Ninth Cause of Actions) by AllState Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proof of Service)(Warren, Andrea) (anh). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Nancy Sussman And Michael Sussman Estates Thereof By And Thru His Special Administer For The Estates First Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement by City Attorney Office, Mara Elliot, Officer Jordan, SDPD Chief David Nieslt, San Diego Police Dept., Ryan Scott, Shelley Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of The Specially Appearing San Diego Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Nancy Sussman And Michael Sussman Estates Thereof By And Thru His Special Administer For The Estates First Amended Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Motion For A More Definite Statement, #2 Proof of Service)(Guess, Steven) (anh). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gregory Pollack, Kenneth So. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Part 1 of 2, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2 of 2)(Green, Matthew) (anh). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the amended complaint [Doc. No. #53 ], the pending motions to dismiss the original complaint [Doc. Nos. #33 , #34 , #36 , #40 , #41 , #48 , #49 ] and related request for oral argument [Doc. No. #45 are DENIED AS MOOT. It is SO ORDERED. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AllState Insurance Company, Bay View Hospital, Board of Registered Nursing, Brent, CHP Office Parra, California Highway Patrol Dept of Motor Vehicles, Chief Watson, City Attorney Office, DMV Director Gordon, Detective Curtis, Discrimination, Violation of Due Process, False Arrest, Dr Prakish Bhabia M.D., Mara Elliot, Anders Holthaus, Joel Johnson, Mary Johnson, Alfonso Martinez, Esperanza Martinez, Michael Sussman Estate Thereof by and Thru his Special Administer for the Estate, Nicole Mondecelo, Officer Highhorse, Officer Jordan, Officer Tharp, Officers 1-400, Offiers Pickard, Wendy Patrick, Gregory Pollack, Prime Healthcare Paradise Valley, LLC dba Paradise Valley Hospital, SDPD Chief David Nieslt, San Diego Police Dept., Ryan Scott, Kenneth So, Summer Stephen in her Role as District Attorney and Individually, Shelley Zimmerman, filed by Nancy Sussman. (anh) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to DMV Director Gordon (anh) Modified on 7/1/2020 (anh). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Summer Stephen in her Role as District Attorney and Individually (anh) Modified on 7/1/2020 (anh). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Nicole Mondecelo (anh) Modified on 7/1/2020 (anh). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1085 CAB (LL).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Recuse Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher by Nancy Sussman. (anh) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20-cv-1085-CAB-DEB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/17/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1085-CAB-BGS.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sjt) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmr) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS122073.), filed by Michael Sussman Estate Thereof by and Thru his Special Administer for the Estate, Nancy Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1085-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Registered Nursing is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENT INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHERRY ROTHSCHILD-BRENT STANLEY M. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHP is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant