This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:14:26 (UTC).

Callaghan v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Callaghan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01633

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Callaghan Susan

Susan Callaghan

Defendant

Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark S. Fistos

Attorney at Zebersky & Payne, LLP

Suite 2150, 110 Se 6Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Edward H. Zebersky

Attorney at Zebersky & Payne, LLP

Suite 2150, 110 Se 6Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Craig E. Rothburd

Attorney at Craig E. Rothburd, PA

320 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 700

Tampa, FL 33606-1459

Kenneth W. DeJean

Attorney at Law Office of Kenneth W. DeJean

417 W University Ave, Po Box 4325

Lafayette, LA 70502

Alec H. Schultz

Attorney at Leon Cosgrove, LLC

255 Alhambra Cir Ste 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134-7412

Scott R. Jeeves

Attorney at Jeeves Law Group, PA

954 First Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Casim Adam Neff

Attorney at Neff Insurance Law, PLLC

Po Box 15063

St. Petersburg, FL 33733-5063

Defendant Attorneys

Hal Kemp Litchford

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Kyle A. Diamantas

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) ORDER granting #40 motion to appear pro hac vice. Kenneth W. DeJean, Esq. may specially appear in this case as counsel for Plaintiff with Scott R. Jeeves, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/18/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#40

(#40) MOTION for Kenneth W. DeJean to appear pro hac vice by Susan Callaghan. (Jeeves, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

14 #7

Exhibit F-Schlotter Declaration

14 #6

Exhibit E-Sos Order

14 #5

Exhibit D-Schenk Order

14 #4

Exhibit C-McGowan Order

14 #3

Exhibit B-Appraisal Demand Letter

14 #2

Exhibit A-Policy (part 2 of 2)

14 #1

Exhibit A-Policy (part 1 of 2)

1 #8

State Court Other Documents State Court Civil Coversheet

1 #7

State Court Other Documents State Court Summons

1 #6

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #5

State Court COMPLAINT Part 3 of 3

1 #4

State Court COMPLAINT Part 2 of 3

1 #3

State Court COMPLAINT Part 1 of 3

1 #2

Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Mayernick

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Orange County, case number 2019-CA-008927-O filed in State Court on 07/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15835586 filed by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Mayernick, #3 State Court COMPLAINT Part 1 of 3, #4 State Court COMPLAINT Part 2 of 3, #5 State Court COMPLAINT Part 3 of 3, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents State Court Summons, #8 State Court Other Documents State Court Civil Coversheet)(Litchford, Hal) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER granting #40 motion to appear pro hac vice. Kenneth W. DeJean, Esq. may specially appear in this case as counsel for Plaintiff with Scott R. Jeeves, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/18/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Diamantas, Kyle) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Kenneth W. DeJean to appear pro hac vice by Susan Callaghan. (Jeeves, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER denying without prejudice #38 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/17/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MOTION for Kenneth W. DeJean to appear pro hac vice by Susan Callaghan. (Jeeves, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER granting #34 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/15/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER denying without prejudice #35 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/15/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for Kenneth W. DeJean to appear pro hac vice by Susan Callaghan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Litchford, Hal) Modified on 10/11/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit A by Susan Callaghan re #31 Response to motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jeeves, Scott) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text (PAM). (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER to strike re: #7 Notice of Carly A. Kligler's Withdrawal as Counsel of Record. A request to withdraw as counsel must be made in a motion in compliance with Local Rules 2.03(b), 3.01(a) and 3.01(g), not by notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/27/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (STRICKEN BY #8 ORDER) MOTION for Carly Kligler to withdraw as attorney by Susan Callaghan re 4 Notice to counsel of Local Rule (Schultz, Alec) Modified on 8/27/2019 (DMA). Modified on 8/28/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Set deadlines: Answer due by 9/12/2019. (JP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Entered in Error. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE to counsel Arthur M. Murray of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond re Complaint. Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/23/2019. (MKH) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE to counsel Carly A. Kligler of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1633-Orl-78LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Orange County, case number 2019-CA-008927-O filed in State Court on 07/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15835586 filed by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Mayernick, #3 State Court COMPLAINT Part 1 of 3, #4 State Court COMPLAINT Part 2 of 3, #5 State Court COMPLAINT Part 3 of 3, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 State Court Other Documents State Court Summons, #8 State Court Other Documents State Court Civil Coversheet)(Litchford, Hal) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.