This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 15:11:17 (UTC).

Susan Coburn v. Toms of Maine, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Susan Coburn filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Toms of Maine, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01036

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Coburn

Defendants

Tom's of Maine, Inc.

Toms of Maine, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aashish Y Desai

Attorney at Desai Law Firm PC

3200 Bristol Street Suite 650

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Maria Adrianne De Castro

Attorney at Desai Law Firm PC

3200 Bristol Street Suite 650

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Ann Marie Wahls

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Gwyn Williams

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

200 Clarendon Street

Boston, MA 02116

Robert James Ellison

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Samuel A. Townsend

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

200 Clarendon Street

Boston, MA 02116

David K. Callahan

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#16

15 #2

Proposed Order

15 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#15

9 #1

Declaration of David K. Callahan

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Samuel A Towsend APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc., designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Gwyn Williams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc., designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Ann Marie Wahls APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc., designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #13 , #18 Non-Resident Attorney David K Callahan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc., designating Robert J Ellison as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/8/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27119941) filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27119941) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): DC missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel A. Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27121228) filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gwyn Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27120858) filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ann Marie Wahls to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27120238) filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David K. Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27119941) filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Order Regarding Schedule for Filing Amended Complaint and Tom's of Maine, Inc.'s Response or Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. Callahan, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Robert James Ellison added to party Toms of Maine, Inc. (pty:dft))(Ellison, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toms of Maine, Inc. (car) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Susan Coburn, identifying Susan Coburn. (Desai, Aashish) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Susan Coburn. (Desai, Aashish) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Susan Coburn. (Desai, Aashish) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26729013 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Susan Coburn. (Attorney Aashish Y Desai added to party Susan Coburn(pty:pla))(Desai, Aashish) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOM'S OF MAINE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Ellison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Callahan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel A. Townsend