This case was last updated from PACER on 05/15/2019 at 21:50:56 (UTC).

Suris v. TMZ Productions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Suris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TMZ Productions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01417

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yaroslav Suris

Defendants

Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.

TMZ Productions, Inc.

EHM Productions, Inc.

John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell Segal

Attorney at Law Offices of Mitchell Segal P.C.

1010 Northern Boulevard, Suite 208

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. EHM Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10 waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; TMZ Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ehm Productions, Inc. d/b/a Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Tmz Productions, Inc. d/b/a/ Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11277913 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. EHM Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10 waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; TMZ Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ehm Productions, Inc. d/b/a Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Tmz Productions, Inc. d/b/a/ Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11277913 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.