This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 07:44:23 (UTC).

Suris v. Skin Ps Brands

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Suris filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Skin Ps Brands. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05112

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yaroslav Suris

Defendant

Skin Ps Brands

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell Segal

Attorney at Law Office of Mitchell S. Segal P.C.

1010 Northern Boulevard, Suite 208

Great Neck, NY 11021

Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth S Merber

Attorney at Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP

90 Broad Street, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Scott H. Goldstein

Attorney at Gallo Vitucci Klar

90 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Skin Ps Brands. (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/22/2021 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5112. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Goldstein on behalf of Skin Ps Brands (notification declined or already on case) (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S Merber on behalf of Skin Ps Brands (aty to be noticed) (Merber, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Skin Ps Brands. (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Skin Ps Brands served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Skin Ps Brands. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Skin Ps Brands filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13575310 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Answer due 1/18/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/16/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Skin Ps Brands. (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/22/2021 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5112. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant to answer or otherwise respond by 12/17/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2020. (Moon, Chloe) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Goldstein on behalf of Skin Ps Brands (notification declined or already on case) (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S Merber on behalf of Skin Ps Brands (aty to be noticed) (Merber, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Skin Ps Brands. (Goldstein, Scott) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Skin Ps Brands served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Skin Ps Brands. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Skin Ps Brands filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13575310 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less