Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:09:36 (UTC).

Surgical Technologies, Inc. v. Venclose, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Surgical Technologies, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Venclose, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01628

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Surgical Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Venclose, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M Windler

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 3500

Mpls, MN 55402-4629

Quin C. Seiler

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 3500

Mpls, MN 55402-4629

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Surgical Technologies, Inc.. Venclose, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Venclose, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Surgical Technologies, Inc.. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Venclose, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7910562) filed by Surgical Technologies, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Windler, Joseph) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Surgical Technologies, Inc.. Venclose, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Venclose, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1628 (WMW/BRT). (KNK) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Surgical Technologies, Inc.. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Venclose, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7910562) filed by Surgical Technologies, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Windler, Joseph) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Venclose Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quin C Seiler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M Windler