This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:37:41 (UTC).

Surgical Specialists of Greater New York v. UMR et al.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Surgical Specialists of Greater New York filed an Other lawsuit against UMR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory H. Woods and Katharine H. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10982

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

Referral Judge

Katharine H. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Surgical Specialists of Greater New York

Defendants

UMR a/k/a UMR, Inc. a division of UnitedHealthcare

UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company

UMR

UMR, Inc., a division of UnitedHealthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Ely Lewin

Attorney at Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP

1633 Broadway, 46Th Floor, 10019

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorney

Michael H Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP (NYC)

666 Third Avenue, 20Th Fl.

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Ely Lewin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated January 18, 2022. Document filed by UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and all such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/28/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMR a/k/a UMR, INC., a division of UnitedHealthcare, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMR..(jgo) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(jgo) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#9

(#9) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/28/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CT Corporation at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005, by personally delivering and leaving the same with PAULA CASTRO, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. UMR served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CT Corporation at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005, by personally delivering and leaving the same with PAULA CASTRO, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael H Bernstein on behalf of UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#13

(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated January 18, 2022. Document filed by UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated January 18, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. UMR answer due 2/18/2022; UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company answer due 2/18/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/19/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#15

(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated February 15, 2022. Document filed by UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated February 15, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. #3 Complaint. UMR answer due 3/4/2022; UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company answer due 3/4/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/16/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated February 15, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. #3 Complaint. UMR answer due 3/4/2022; UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company answer due 3/4/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/16/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated February 15, 2022. Document filed by UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated January 18, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. UMR answer due 2/18/2022; UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company answer due 2/18/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/19/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint : Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael H. Bernstein dated January 18, 2022. Document filed by UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael H Bernstein on behalf of UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. UMR served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CT Corporation at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005, by personally delivering and leaving the same with PAULA CASTRO, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service was accepted by c/o CT Corporation at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005, by personally delivering and leaving the same with PAULA CASTRO, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/28/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company..(jgo) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UMR..(jgo) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UMR a/k/a UMR, INC., a division of UnitedHealthcare, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and all such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/28/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against UMR, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Ely Lewin to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lewin, Jacob) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25502191)Document filed by Surgical Specialists of Greater New York..(Lewin, Jacob) Modified on 12/27/2021 (gp). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMR INC. LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H. Bernstein