Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:17:20 (UTC).

Supima v. Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Supima filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Tradeline Enterprises Pvt , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10568

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Supima

Defendant

Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick W Kelly

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Charles F Hauff

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 850041

Anthony T King

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Supima, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #20 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 21 served on 02/03/2020. (King, Anthony) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

19 #4

Exhibit 3

19 #3

Exhibit 2

19 #2

Exhibit 1

19 #1

Declaration

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from and to Confirm Arbitration Award ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order) (King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

18 #2

Exhibit 1

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:15-cv-08048-JAK-RAO, filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Supima. Related Case(s): LA CV15-08048 JAK (RAOx) (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Supima, identifying Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Supima, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #20 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 21 served on 02/03/2020. (King, Anthony) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DKT. #18 ) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (DKT. #19 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motions from May 4, 2020 to May 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Because Defendant has not yet made an appearance in this action, Plaintiff is ordered to serve this Order and the Order Setting Rule 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #20 ) on Plaintiff and file a proof of service no later than February 3, 2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from and to Confirm Arbitration Award ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order) (King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:15-cv-08048-JAK-RAO, filed by Plaintiff Supima. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Concerning Supima's Motion for Alternative Service of Process #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE RELIEF CONCERNING SUPIMAS MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document: Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by January 29, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Concerning Supima's Motion for Alternative Service of Process filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of King ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #2 Exhibit 1 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #3 Exhibit 2 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #4 Exhibit 3 to King Decl ISO Appl for Ex Parte Relief, #5 PROPOSED Motion for Alternative Service of Process; Memo of Ps__As, #6 Declaration of King ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #7 Exhibit 1 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #8 Exhibit 2 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #9 Exhibit 3 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process, #10 Exhibit 4 to King Decl ISO Motion for Alternative Service of Process) (King, Anthony) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Anthony T. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima, designating Patrick W. Kelly as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles F. Hauff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Supima (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25040486) filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-08048 JAK(RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-10568 JAK(RAOx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Supima. Related Case(s): LA CV15-08048 JAK (RAOx) (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Supima, identifying Tradeline Enterprises Pvt., Ltd.. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Supima. (Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24951264 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Supima(pty:pla))(Kelly, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick W. Kelly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Tom King