This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:00:43 (UTC).

SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. v. THORNTON et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2020 SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THORNTON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. SCHROEDER

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC.

SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. doing business as NATIONAL AGENTS ALLIANCE

Defendants

JASON J. THORNTON

WILLIAM N. SAUNDERS

GLENN A. LAMB

DORIAN K. SAUNDERS

SANSON GARZA

SHONDEL A. FERGUSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANIEL F. E. SMITH

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD, LLP

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

ROBERT JAMES KING, III

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

Defendant Attorneys

MARK R. SIGMON

Attorney at SIGMON LAW, PLLC

5 W Hargett St., Suite 1001

Raleigh, NC 27601

DONALD G. HUGGINS, JR.

Attorney at HAIRSTON LANE, P.A.

434 Fayetteville St., Ste. 2350

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Supplemental against defendant All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC..(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

27 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

27 #1

Exhibit Amended And Supplemental Complaint

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended And Supplemental Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#26

(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC..(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

25 #1

Certificate of Service

#25

(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GLENN A. LAMB (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#24

(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WILLIAM N. SAUNDERS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#10

Electronic Notice To/From Attorney Mark Sigmon on 4/2/2020. #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JASON J. THORNTON is deemed MOOT in light of #26 AMENDED COMPLAINT and forthcoming Amended and Supplemental Complaint. (See 4/1/2020 Text Order.) (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19-CVS-10720 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JASON J. THORNTON. (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARK R. SIGMON on behalf of Defendant JASON J. THORNTON. (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2748283), filed by JASON J. THORNTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Supplemental against defendant All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC..(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Notice To/From Attorney Mark Sigmon on 4/2/2020. #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JASON J. THORNTON is deemed MOOT in light of #26 AMENDED COMPLAINT and forthcoming Amended and Supplemental Complaint. (See 4/1/2020 Text Order.) (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #27 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Amended and Supplemental Complaint (in the form of the attachment to #27 Consent Motion) by 04/08/2020. Defendant Jason J. Thornton is relieved of the obligation to answer or otherwise respond to #26 Amended Complaint and shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended and Supplemental Complaint by 04/22/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/01/2020. (AULD, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #27 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended And Supplemental Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC..(SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GLENN A. LAMB (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WILLIAM N. SAUNDERS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ***FILED IN ERROR*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WILLIAM N. SAUNDERS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) Modified on 3/20/2020 to mark filed in error. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant DORIAN K. SAUNDERS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGGINS, DONALD) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC.. (SMITH, DANIEL) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT JAMES KING, III on behalf of Plaintiff SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. (KING, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Right to Consent. (Sheets, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to JASON J. THORNTON. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19-CVS-10720, issued 12/20/2019 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19-CVS-10720 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JASON J. THORNTON. (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARK R. SIGMON on behalf of Defendant JASON J. THORNTON. (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against SUPERIOR PERFORMERS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2748283), filed by JASON J. THORNTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (SIGMON, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less