This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 10:01:45 (UTC).

Supercell Oy v. GREE, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Supercell Oy filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GREE, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPERCELL OY

Defendant

GREE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael John Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Bryan A. Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jennifer Rene Bush

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

801 California St

Mountain View, CA 94041

Geoffrey Robert Miller

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - New York

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

Christopher L. Larson

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jessica Andrea Martinez Kaempf

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Seattle

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Kolassa

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

William Edward Mosley

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Steven David Moore

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111-3834

Michael T Morlock

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Norris Power Boothe

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Menlo Park

1080 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

John C Alemanni

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Alton Absher, III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP NC

1001 West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Taylor Higgins Ludlam

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - Raleigh

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Kasey E. Koballa

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP - DC

607 14Th St Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#77

#76

#75

#74

#73

#72

#71

#70

#69

1 #17

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

199 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of GREE, INC (Alemanni, John) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Norris Power Boothe on behalf of GREE, INC (Boothe, Norris) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kasey E. Koballa on behalf of GREE, INC (Koballa, Kasey) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Morlock on behalf of GREE, INC (Morlock, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alton Absher, III on behalf of GREE, INC (Absher, Alton) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of GREE, INC (Ludlam, Taylor) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE by SUPERCELL OY [Corrected Notice of Related Cases] (Kaempf, Jessica) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE by SUPERCELL OY re #68 Notice of Attorney Appearance [Corrected Notice of Appearance] (Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher L. Larson on behalf of SUPERCELL OY (Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to GREE, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Non-Infringement and Invalidity; Breach of Contract against GREE, Inc.. Filed bySupercell Oy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Supercell Oy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Miller ISO Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Non-Infringement and Invalidity; Breach of Contract, #4 Unredacted Version of First Amended Complaint, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O)(Miller, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Supercell Oy identifying Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Ltd. for Supercell Oy. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Supercell Oy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Miller ISO Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Patent Non-Infringement and Invalidity; Breach of Contract, #4 Unredacted Version of Complaint, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O)(Miller, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Re Patent Non-Infringement and Invalidity; Breach of Contract against GREE, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13129888.). Filed bySupercell Oy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Edward Mosley