This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 11:37:39 (UTC).

Super Star Hospitality Group Inc v. AmGuard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Super Star Hospitality Group Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGuard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00241

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Super Star Hospitality Group Inc

Super Star Hospitality Group Inc a California Corporation doing business as Kai Japanese Roots

Defendant

AmGuard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J Furtado

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creak North Drive Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32608236 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Attorney David J Furtado added to party Super Star Hospitality Group Inc(pty:pla))(Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc, (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#11

(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc(Furtado, David) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc(Furtado, David) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc, (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32608236 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Super Star Hospitality Group Inc. (Attorney David J Furtado added to party Super Star Hospitality Group Inc(pty:pla))(Furtado, David) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Jeffrey Furtado