This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 07:05:23 (UTC).

Super Micro Computer, Inc. v. R Associates, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Super Micro Computer, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07975

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Super Micro Computer, Inc.

Defendants

Thomas A. Burg Bar No. 211937 Bialson Bergen M Bialson, Bergen & Schwab

R Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas A. Burg

Attorney at Bialson, Bergen & Schwab

633 Menlo Avenue, Suite 300

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#22

#19

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

#9

#8

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2021) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • Docket(#21) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2021) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Super Micro Computer, Inc... (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE RE ADVANCEMENT OF 2/16/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 2/9/21.Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/21 09:30 AM before Magistrate Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 2/2/21.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is n o document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#17) 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Super Micro Computer, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) **AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE** The Clerk's Notice filed at ECF No. 15 was filed in error. The case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Per #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order: Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#15) **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD** (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen. Judge Luck H. Koh no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Super Micro Computer, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to R Associates, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Super Micro Computer, Inc. . (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Please use the updated Civil Cover Sheet. You can find it in our website www.cand.uscourts.gov under Civil Forms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Super Micro Computer, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Super Micro Computer, Inc. . (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For 1. Breach of Contract; 2. Account Stated (Common Count); 3. Open Book Account (Common Count); 4. Quantum Valebant (Common Count) against R Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15184973.). Filed bySuper Micro Computer, Inc.. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Super Micro Computer, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Burg