This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:13:06 (UTC).

Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00414

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Daniel F. Olejko

Terry A. Saad

Jeffrey Ray Bragalone

Defendant Attorneys

Amy K Liang

G. Blake Thompson

J. Mark Mann

 

Court Documents

49 #1

*Restricted*

#49

(#49) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00259. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#48

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#47

(#47) Redacted Copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer of #45 Sealed Order by Google LLC. (Mann, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#46

(#46) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#45

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

44 #1

Ex. A

#44

(#44) NOTICE Google LLC's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Google LLC re #14 Sealed Motion Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Silverman, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14591102), filed by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00259. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Sealed AMENDED Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Redacted Copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer of #45 Sealed Order by Google LLC. (Mann, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ***VACATED PER ORDER DATED 11/5/2021***Sealed Order DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) Modified on 11/5/2021 (ir). [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE Google LLC's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Google LLC re #14 Sealed Motion Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Silverman, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STATUS REPORT for Case Readiness by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Saad, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Redacted Copy Google LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) of #40 Sealed Document by Google LLC. (Mann, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel for Jerry D. Tice II, as counsel for Plaintiff in the above-captioned lawsuit. Upon consideration, the Court GRANTS THE MOTION.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal isGRANTED, Jerry D. Tice II is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this lawsuit, and the Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect that Jerry D. Tice II has withdrawn as counsel and Mr. Tice no longer needs be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in thiscivil action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry D. Tice, II on behalf of Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC (Tice, Jerry) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel F. Olejko on behalf of Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC (Olejko, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill added to party Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC(pty:pla) (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14591102), filed by Super Interconnect Techonologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less