This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:08:29 (UTC).

Sunstone Information Defense, Inc. v. F5 Networks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Sunstone Information Defense, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against F5 Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-09529

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

F5 Networks, Inc.

Capital One Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach John Connor

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee, PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Jennifer Tatum Lee

Attorney at Connor Lee, PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Kevin Sean Kudlac

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Rd, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Cecil Elvis Key, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Cecil Key

1934 Old Gallows Road, Suite 350

Vienna, VA 22182

William Rueger Poynter

Attorney at Williams Mullen (Norfolk)

999 Waterside Dr, Suite 1700

Norfolk, VA 23510

Bernard Joseph DiMuro

Attorney at DiMuro Ginsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Christopher Hanba

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

607 W. 3Rd Street, Suite 2500

Austin, TX 78701

Jonathan Richard Mook

Attorney at DiMuroGinsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Michael S. Lieberman

Attorney at DiMuroGinsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Jonathan Daniel Baker

Attorney at Dickinson Wright RLLP

800 W. California Avenue, Suite 110

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Dino Hadzibegovic

Attorney at Dickinson Wright RLLP

800 W. California Avenue, Suite 110

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Mark Howard Rogge

Attorney at Dickinson Wright RLLP

800 W. California Avenue, Suite 110

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Shane Brun

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

601 S. California Ave., Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Stephen Edward Noona

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles PC

1 Commercial Pl, P.O. Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23514

Stephen Eric Baskin

Attorney at King & Spalding (DC)

1700 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20006-4707

 

Court Documents

78 #1

Standing Order

78 #78

Main Document

77 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

77 #77

Main Document

#76

(#76) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#75

(#75) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2022.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#74

(#74) USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 21-17080 re writ of mandamus. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

73 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

73 #73

Main Document

1 #27

Exhibit

1 #23

Exhibit

1 #22

Exhibit

1 #20

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Per sons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2022.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 21-17080 re writ of mandamus. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/5/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Hanba. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/3/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/27/2029. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to F5 Networks, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:21cv87. (afar) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Edward Hanba and Certification of Local Counsel Cecil E. Key Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7595282. by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cabrach John Connor and Certification of Local Counsel Cecil E. Key Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7595274. by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, /AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,,, by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,,, by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint /Complaint for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7595020.), filed by Sunstone Information Defense, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Civil Cover Sheet)(Key, Cecil) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone Information Defense, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shane Brun