This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 08:20:34 (UTC).

Anthony Sunseri v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Anthony Sunseri filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08932

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Sunseri

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian James Brazier

Attorney at Brian Brazier Law

4425 North 78Th Street, Suite 222B

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Lauren Tegan Rodkey

Attorney at Price Law Group APC

6345 Balboa Boulevard Suite 247

Encino, CA 91316

Defendant Attorneys

Erica Danielle Hendricks

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer Sun

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): REMINDER RE MISSING identifying assigned Judge and Magistrate's initials on official case number. Please refer to 9/30/20 Notice of Assignment, docket no. 6, correct case number is to read henceforth as: 2:20cv08932-MCS(RAOx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian James Brazier counsel for Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. Brian J. Brazier is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/17/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Jennifer Sun added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Erica Danielle Hendricks added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

8 #1

Experian

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Experian) (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri, (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#1

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Erica Danielle Hendricks added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): REMINDER RE MISSING identifying assigned Judge and Magistrate's initials on official case number. Please refer to 9/30/20 Notice of Assignment, docket no. 6, correct case number is to read henceforth as: 2:20cv08932-MCS(RAOx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian James Brazier counsel for Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. Brian J. Brazier is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 11/17/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Jennifer Sun added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sun, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Erica Danielle Hendricks added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Hendricks, Erica) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Caden Ramirez, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alisha Smith, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lom) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Experian) (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri, (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28297059 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Sunseri. (Attorney Brian James Brazier added to party Anthony Sunseri(pty:pla))(Brazier, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian James Brazier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Tegan Rodkey