This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 09:15:36 (UTC).

Sundby v. Myers et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Sundby filed an Other lawsuit against Myers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Todd W. Robinson, Karen S. Crawford and Jinsook Ohta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02013

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

Presiding Judges

Todd W. Robinson

Jinsook Ohta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale Sundby

Tucson, AZ 85750

Defendants

Jeffrey Myers

Kathleen Myers

Andres Salsido

Equity Trust Company

Fasack Investments LLC

Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan

Christopher Myers

Vickie McCarty

Todd B. Cobin

Barbara A. Cobin

Delores Thompson

Kimberly Gill Rabinoff

Does 1-X

Does I-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lewis Raymond Landau

22287 Mulholland Highway, Suite 318

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice

13 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Fasack Investments LLC, Barbara A. Cobin, Kathleen Myers, Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Vickie McCarty, Jeffrey Myers, Delores Thompson, Christopher Myers, Andres Salsido, Todd B. Cobin, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Equity Trust Company re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing filed by Barbara A. Cobin, Andres Salsido, Christopher Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Equity Trust Company, Todd B. Cobin, Delores Thompson, Kathleen Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan with Proof of Service. (Landau, Lewis) (zda). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

10 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Todd W. Robinson (TWR) to the calendar of the Honorable Jinsook Ohta (JO). All pending dates - whether before Judge Robinson or any magistrate judge - remain unchanged. The new case number is 21cv2013 JO (KSC). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 01/03/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/3/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#7

(#7) OBJECTION by Dale Sundby re #5 Notice of Related Case (fth) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/3/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson of case(s) 3:19-cv-00390-GPC-AHG with Proof of Service. (Landau, Lewis) Proposed LNO created and emailed to chambers (fth). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Joint Motion and Stipulation re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint with Proof of Service by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson. (Landau, Lewis)Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Barbara A. Cobin(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Todd B. Cobin(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Equity Trust Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Fasack Investments LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Vickie McCarty(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Christopher Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Jeffrey Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Kathleen Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Kimberly Gill Rabinoff(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Andres Salsido(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Delores Thompson(pty:dft) (fth). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiff not receiving notice electronically. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Dale Sundby. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #2

Receipt for payment

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Notice and Proof of Service, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Notice of Hearing and Proof of Service by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice)(Landau, Lewis) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Fasack Investments LLC, Barbara A. Cobin, Kathleen Myers, Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Vickie McCarty, Jeffrey Myers, Delores Thompson, Christopher Myers, Andres Salsido, Todd B. Cobin, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Equity Trust Company re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing filed by Barbara A. Cobin, Andres Salsido, Christopher Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Equity Trust Company, Todd B. Cobin, Delores Thompson, Kathleen Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan with Proof of Service. (Landau, Lewis) (zda). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #12 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Landau, Lewis) (axc). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Todd W. Robinson (TWR) to the calendar of the Honorable Jinsook Ohta (JO). All pending dates - whether before Judge Robinson or any magistrate judge - remain unchanged. The new case number is 21cv2013 JO (KSC). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 01/03/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/3/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTION by Dale Sundby re #5 Notice of Related Case (fth) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/3/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson of case(s) 3:19-cv-00390-GPC-AHG with Proof of Service. (Landau, Lewis) Proposed LNO created and emailed to chambers (fth). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Joint Motion and Stipulation re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint with Proof of Service by Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Barbara A. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Andres Salsido, Delores Thompson. (Landau, Lewis)Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Barbara A. Cobin(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Todd B. Cobin(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Equity Trust Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Fasack Investments LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Vickie McCarty(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Christopher Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Jeffrey Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Kathleen Myers(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Kimberly Gill Rabinoff(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Andres Salsido(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Raymond Landau added to party Delores Thompson(pty:dft) (fth). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiff not receiving notice electronically. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Dale Sundby. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Against Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Andres Salsido, Equity Trust Company, Fasack Investments LLC; Benning Management Group 401 (k) Profit Sharing Plan, Christoper Myers, Vickie McCarty, Todd B. Cobin, Barbara A. Cobin, Dolores Thompson, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Does 1-X (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number CAS134346.), filed by Dale Sundby. (Attachments: #1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt for payment)The new case number is 3:21-cv-2013-TWR-KSC. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fasack Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant