This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2019 at 07:00:50 (UTC).

Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. v. 3 Day Blinds, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2019 Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against 3 Day Blinds, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Carl W. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Carl W. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.

Defendant

3 Day Blinds, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew K Schriever

Attorney at HUTCHISON & STEFFEN

10080 W Alta Dr, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. 3 Day Blinds, LLC served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Polywood Fabrication, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunburst Shutters Las Vegas, Inc. for Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. added. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to 3 Day Blinds, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3 Day Blinds, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5399476) by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/20/2019.(Schriever, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. 3 Day Blinds, LLC served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/28/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Polywood Fabrication, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunburst Shutters Las Vegas, Inc. for Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. added. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to 3 Day Blinds, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3 Day Blinds, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5399476) by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/20/2019.(Schriever, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.