This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2020 at 09:24:00 (UTC).

Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Western Alliance Bank et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Sunbelt Rentals, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Western Alliance Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03323

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.

Defendants

Buffalo Airport Alameda Lodging, LLC

DD& B Construction, Inc.

Primus Alameda Lodging, LLC

ProSet, Inc.

Western Alliance Bank

Baywood Hotels, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tara L Blake

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

16 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#16

#15

#13

#12

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 Rental Out Tickets

1 #5

Exhibit 5 Sunbelt Rentals Terms and Conditions

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Mechanics Lien - 45976 Warm Springs

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Account Summary

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Invoice Copies

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Application for Credit & Rental Agreement

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blake, Tara) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/27/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to Baywood Hotels, Inc., Buffalo Airport Alameda Lodging, LLC, DD& B Construction, Inc., Primus Alameda Lodging, LLC, ProSet, Inc., Western Alliance Bank. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc... (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/20/2020) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ashtead Holdings PLC, Corporate Parent Ashtead Group plc, Corporate Parent for Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Baywood Hotels, Inc., Buffalo Airport Alameda Lodging, LLC, DD& B Construction, Inc., Primus Alameda Lodging, LLC, ProSet, Inc., Western Alliance Bank ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14476132.). Filed bySunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Application for Credit & Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Invoice Copies, #3 Exhibit 3 Account Summary, #4 Exhibit 4 Mechanics Lien - 45976 Warm Springs, #5 Exhibit 5 Sunbelt Rentals Terms and Conditions, #6 Exhibit 6 Rental Out Tickets, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blake, Tara) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DD & B CONSTRUCTION INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSET, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN ALLIANCE BANK is a litigant