1:22-CV-03702
06/23/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Civil Right - Other Civil Right
Marcia M. Henry
Pamela K. Chen
Jiaming Sun
Rite Aid Corporation
Keith A. Raven
EDNY Brooklyn Pro Se Office Contact Information
City Bar Justice Center Flyer
Individual Practice Rules
Proposed Discovery Plan
(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone initial conference in this Title VII case is scheduled for 8/03/2022 at 9:00AM Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry Pro se Plaintiff Jiaming Sun and counsel for Defendant Rite Aid Corporation must attend. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 888-808-6929. The access code is 9281384. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. The parties should be prepared to discuss the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf) at the initial conference. For information about court procedures, a party who is not represented by a lawyer may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665 or by visiting the court's website at #www.nyed.uscourts.gov/self-representation. A party who is not represented by a lawyer may seek limited legal assistance by contacting the Federal Pro Se Legal Assistance Project of the City Bar Justice Center at (212) 382-4729.A copy of this Scheduling Order, the attached Initial Conference Order, the Courts Individual Rules, the full docket, a blank Proposed Discovery Plan, and information about the Federal Pro Se Legal Assistance Project will be mailed to pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/07/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan, #2 Individual Practice Rules, #3 City Bar Justice Center Flyer, #4 EDNY Brooklyn Pro Se Office Contact Information) (Castro, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
Civil Cover Sheet
Exhibit C (Notice to State Court)
Exhibit B (State Court Affidavit of Service)
Exhibit A (State Court Complaint)
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rite Aid Corporation from Supreme Court of New York, Queens County, case number 710081/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15685904) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Affidavit of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bluestone, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
(#10) Letter Re. Settlement by Rite Aid Corporation (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Raven on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
(#7) ORDER re #6 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney. Defendant Rite Aid Corporation consents to substitute its current attorney, Lawrence Bluestone of Genova Burns LLC, for attorney Keith A. Raven of Raven & Kolbe LLP. The consent order is so-ordered. See attached. Attorney Lawrence Bluestone and the law firm of Genova Burns LLC are terminated from the docket. Incoming defense counsel Raven must file a notice of appearance by 07/07/2022. Incoming defense counsel shall mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/06/2022. (Heery-Hyatt, Micaela) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Keith A. Raven (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Rite Aid Corporation. (Bluestone, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
DocketORDER re #10 Letter Re. Settlement: Defendant Rite Aid Corporation advises that the parties have settled this Title VII case. The parties are directed to file their stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report by 08/25/2022. The initial conference scheduled for 08/03/2022 is adjourned without date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/20/2022. (Castro, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) Letter Re. Settlement by Rite Aid Corporation (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 07/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone initial conference in this Title VII case is scheduled for 8/03/2022 at 9:00AM Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry Pro se Plaintiff Jiaming Sun and counsel for Defendant Rite Aid Corporation must attend. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 888-808-6929. The access code is 9281384. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. The parties should be prepared to discuss the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf) at the initial conference. For information about court procedures, a party who is not represented by a lawyer may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665 or by visiting the court's website at #www.nyed.uscourts.gov/self-representation. A party who is not represented by a lawyer may seek limited legal assistance by contacting the Federal Pro Se Legal Assistance Project of the City Bar Justice Center at (212) 382-4729.A copy of this Scheduling Order, the attached Initial Conference Order, the Courts Individual Rules, the full docket, a blank Proposed Discovery Plan, and information about the Federal Pro Se Legal Assistance Project will be mailed to pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/07/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan, #2 Individual Practice Rules, #3 City Bar Justice Center Flyer, #4 EDNY Brooklyn Pro Se Office Contact Information) (Castro, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Raven on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ORDER re #6 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney. Defendant Rite Aid Corporation consents to substitute its current attorney, Lawrence Bluestone of Genova Burns LLC, for attorney Keith A. Raven of Raven & Kolbe LLP. The consent order is so-ordered. See attached. Attorney Lawrence Bluestone and the law firm of Genova Burns LLC are terminated from the docket. Incoming defense counsel Raven must file a notice of appearance by 07/07/2022. Incoming defense counsel shall mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/06/2022. (Heery-Hyatt, Micaela) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Keith A. Raven (Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Rite Aid Corporation. (Bluestone, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid Corporation (Bluestone, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rite Aid Corporation from Supreme Court of New York, Queens County, case number 710081/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15685904) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Affidavit of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bluestone, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
[-] Read Less