This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

Summit Management Services Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Summit Management Services Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02764

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Summit Management Services Inc.

Defendant

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 14 October 2021. Consent Form due by 11/30/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8125260)Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Summit Management Services Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Summit Management Services Inc..(Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 14 October 2021. Consent Form due by 11/30/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2021 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8125260)Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Summit Management Services Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Summit Management Services Inc..(Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Edward Bukowski