This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2020 at 08:51:35 (UTC).

Summers v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Summers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01947

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Summers

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daryoush Toofanian

Attorney at Rad Law Firm

8001 Lbj Freeway, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Ramona Martinez

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Bevan A Rhine

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Summers. (Toofanian, Daryoush) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Discovery due by 8/13/2021. Status Report due by 8/13/2021. Motions due by 7/23/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/24/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/27/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Martinez, Ramona) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D discl stmt

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B state docket

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11018841) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Martinez, Ramona) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Summers. (Toofanian, Daryoush) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Discovery due by 8/13/2021. Status Report due by 8/13/2021. Motions due by 7/23/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/24/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/27/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Martinez, Ramona) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11018841) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Martinez, Ramona) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramona Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bevan A Rhine