This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 11:22:47 (UTC).

SUMMER v. COLOR STREET, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 SUMMER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COLOR STREET, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-16108

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASANDRA J SUMMER

Pinehurst, NC 28374

Defendant

COLOR STREET, LLC

61 Kuller Road

Clifton, NJ 07011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROLANDO A. DIAZ

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

1000 N West St #1203

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

3 #8

Text of Proposed Order

3 #7

Exhibit F

3 #6

Exhibit E

3 #3

Exhibit B

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

2 #7

Exhibit F

2 #6

Exhibit E

2 #5

Exhibit D

2 #4

Exhibit C

2 #3

Exhibit B

2 #2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Memorandum

#2

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT COLOR STREET, LLC without prejudice; Plaintiff withdraws all pending pro hac vice motions for the admission of Ryan T. Kennedy, Jonathan D. Perrone and Timothy J. Turner. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/30/2020. (sm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Color Street, LLC by CASANDRA J SUMMER (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; that this matter shall proceed in the normal course.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/18/2020. (ld, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Ryan T. Kennedy. Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Ryan T. Kennedy by CASANDRA J SUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Timothy J. Turner, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Temporary Restraining Order (CORRECTED), #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Jonathan D. Perrone. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COLOR STREET, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Jonathan D. Perrone by CASANDRA J SUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification, #3 Certification)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Timothy J. Turner by CASANDRA J SUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Certification, #3 Certification)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Temporary Restraining Order (CORRECTED) by CASANDRA J SUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Temporary Restraining Order by CASANDRA J SUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COLOR STREET, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11655926), filed by CASANDRA J SUMMER.(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLANDO A. DIAZ