This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2019 at 07:08:44 (UTC).

SUMMAR v. STRONG

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 SUMMAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STRONG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUREN C. SUMMAR

Defendant

JEFFERSON STRONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAYTON RAYMOND SYFRETT

Attorney at CLAYTON R SYFRETT PA - PANAMA CITY FL

Po Box 1186

Panama City, FL 32402

Defendant Attorney

BRENTT EARL PALMER

Attorney at YOUNG BILL ROUMBOS ETC PA - PENSACOLA FL

226 S Palafox Place, Seville Tower - 7Th Fl

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - That this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/7/2019. (MB) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (MB) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LAUREN C. SUMMAR (SYFRETT, CLAYTON) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 Notice of Settlement. Parties shall file a status report 30 days from the date of this Order if a notice of voluntary dismissal or stipulation for dismissal has not been filed by then. (Status Report due by 11/8/2019, if stipulation or notice of voluntary dismissal not filed.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/8/2019. (MB) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice of Settlement (MB) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement by JEFFERSON STRONG (PALMER, BRENTT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines re #5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Estate of Rebecca Kay Summar against JEFFERSON STRONG. (Answer due by 10/9/2019). (MB) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS - That Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED as moot and that Defendant has 14 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint (Doc. #5 ). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/25/2019. (MB) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 First Amended Complaint (MB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT Estate of Rebecca Kay Summar against JEFFERSON STRONG, filed by LAUREN C. SUMMAR. (SYFRETT, CLAYTON) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MB) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/2/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2019. Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/18/2019. (MB) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JEFFERSON STRONG. (PALMER, BRENTT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PALMER, BRENTT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JEFFERSON STRONG from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, FL, case number 2019-CA-003204. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4623504.), filed by JEFFERSON STRONG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (PALMER, BRENTT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less