This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2020 at 08:39:05 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Sullivan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kari Sullivan

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Graham Gamble

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Elissa M. Holman

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Wesley T. Graham

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Defendant Attorneys

Christine E. Bestor Townsend

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (WI)

1243 North 10Th Street, Suite 210

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Patrick R. Martin

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC (MN)

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 1800

Minneapols, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Bestor Townsend on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Townsend, Christine) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Martin on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kari Sullivan; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver served on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Graham, Wesley) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Kari Sullivan. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/1/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/1/2020.(Graham, Wesley) Modified on 3/2/2020 Filing fee paid $400 receipt #0863-4076672 (slg). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Graham Gamble

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley T. Graham