This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:01:35 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Safeway et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Sullivan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Safeway. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03187

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kendra Sullivan

Marianna Williams

Defendants

Albertson's LLC

Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC

Albertsons Holdings LLC

Albertsons Holding LLC

Ink Holdings LLC

Cerberus Capital Management LP

American Food and Drug LLC

Albertsons Companies Inc.

AB Acquisition LLC

AB Manegement Services Corp

Safeway

New Albertson's, Inc.

Safeway, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James C. Sturdevant

Attorney at The Sturdevant Law Firm

4040 Civic Center Drive, Suite 200

San Rafael, CA 94903

Defendant Attorney

Alison S. Hightower

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading filed by AB Acquisition LLC, AB Manegement Services Corp, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Holding LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Cerberus Capital Management LP, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertson's, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Kendra Sullivan and Marianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hightower, Alison) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Notice and Summons served on All Defendants on June 19, 2019, filed by Kendra Sullivan. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kendra Sullivan.. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AB Acquisition LLC, AB Manegement Services Corp, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Holding LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Cerberus Capital Management LP, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertson's, Inc., Safeway, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13417667.). Filed by Kendra Sullivan, Marianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating #8 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading. Court approval is not required, because the stipulation does not alter the date of any event or deadline fixed by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading filed by AB Acquisition LLC, AB Manegement Services Corp, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Holding LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Cerberus Capital Management LP, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertson's, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Kendra Sullivan and Marianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hightower, Alison) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. No Further Action Necessary Re: #7 Affidavit of Service filed by Kendra Sullivan (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Notice and Summons served on All Defendants on June 19, 2019, filed by Kendra Sullivan. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kendra Sullivan.. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to AB Acquisition LLC, AB Manegement Services Corp, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Holding LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Cerberus Capital Management LP, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertson's, Inc., Safeway, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Additionally, a maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file the summons in its entirety using the correct event. Re: 2 Summons filed by Marianna Williams, Kendra Sullivan (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13417667.). Filed by Kendra Sullivan, Marianna Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sturdevant, James) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skaggs is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertson's Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AB Acquisition LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CERBERUS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT L.P. DBA ALBERTSON'S SUPERMARKET is a litigant