This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:18:19 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Panther Petroleum. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Sullivan filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Panther Petroleum LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01259

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Sullivan

Defendants

O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.

Panther Petroleum. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Lewis Jenkins, Jr

Attorney at JENKINS DEDMON HAYES LAW GROUP LLP

P O Box 846, 426 Troy Ave

Dyersburg, TN 38025-0846

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

John R. McCarroll, III

Attorney at WYATT TARRANT & COMBS, LLP- Memphis

1715 Aaron Brenner Dr., Ste. 800

Memphis, TN 38120

R. Dale Thomas

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC - Jackson

209 E. Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/16/19. (mbm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

13 #2

Certificate of Consultation

13 #1

Memorandum

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Panther Petroleum. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Thomas, R.) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Dale Thomas on behalf of Panther Petroleum. LLC (Thomas, R.) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 DEFENDANT O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/11/19. (skc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (McCarroll, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. McCarroll, III on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (McCarroll, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

6 #1

Summons O'reilly

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., and Panther Petroleum. LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons O'reilly)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #4

Summons Summons - O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Summons - Panther Petroleum, LLC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Bill of Sale / Invoice

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3212332), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Bill of Sale / Invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet, #3 Summons Summons - Panther Petroleum, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.)(Jenkins, William) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/16/19. (mbm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Panther Petroleum. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Thomas, R.) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Dale Thomas on behalf of Panther Petroleum. LLC (Thomas, R.) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Notice of Appearance by Atty John McCarroll has been filed. Please note: The address listed on the Notice of Appearance differs from that of the address in the CM/ECF database reflected on the face of the docket sheet. Counsel is responsible for updating contact information. Please see the court's website www.tnwd.uscourts.gov; CM/ECF Links; Maintaining Your Contact Information in CM/ECF and PACER, and follow instructions for updating contact information. (skp) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 DEFENDANT O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/11/19. (skc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (McCarroll, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. McCarroll, III on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (McCarroll, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., and Panther Petroleum. LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons O'reilly)(skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3212332), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Bill of Sale / Invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet, #3 Summons Summons - Panther Petroleum, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.)(Jenkins, William) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Lewis Jenkins, Jr