This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 08:59:14 (UTC).

Sullivan v. National Express LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Sullivan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Express LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M. Karas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-05789

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M. Karas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Sullivan

Defendants

National Express LLC

Durham D&M LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davida S. Perry

Attorney at Schwartz Perry & Heller LLP

3 Park Avenue, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Brian Adam Heller

Attorney at Schwartz Perry & Heller LLP

3 Park Avenue, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Durham D&M LLC waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; National Express LLC waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Durham D&M LLC, National Express LLC. (sj) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express LLC and Durham D&M LLC, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian Adam Heller to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Link the summons to the correctly filed complaint (document 7);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Adam Heller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment); County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); the County code has been modified to Orange;. (pc) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against Durham D&M LLC, National Express LLC. Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express LLC and Durham D&M LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2021 (pc). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING -DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heller, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2021 (pc). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Davida S. Perry on behalf of Elizabeth Sullivan..(Perry, Davida) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express LLC and Durham D&M LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2021 (pc). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heller, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Durham D&M LLC, National Express LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24758243)Document filed by Elizabeth Sullivan..(Heller, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DURHAM D & M LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davida S. Perry