This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:44:01 (UTC).

SULLIVAN v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 SULLIVAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMMA SULLIVAN

Defendants

MERCK & CO., INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURA A. FELDMAN

Attorney at FELDMAN & PINTO

30 S. 15Th Street, Suite 15Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

KAREN A. CONFOY

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP, PC

997 Lenox Drive, Bldg 3

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

STEVEN J. DAROCI

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

997 Lenox Drive, Building 3

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

 

Court Documents

27 #2

Certificate of Service

27 #1

Declaration of Karen A. Confoy

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#25

(#25) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#24

(#24) CONSENT ORDER: Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Bijan Esfandiari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2022. (jal) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

8 #2

Certificate of Service

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

7 #2

Declaration Laura Feldman

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. DAROCI on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (DAROCI, STEVEN) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 2/17/2022 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/18/2022. (eh, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

(#2) Certification on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEF in Opposition filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. re #8 MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy, #2 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, BIJAN ESFANDIARI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Bijan Esfandiari, receipt number TRE125102. (jem) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Laura Feldman on 2/21/2022 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bijan Esfandiari to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketTEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/17/2022. (eh, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CONSENT ORDER: Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Bijan Esfandiari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2022. (jal) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #23 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff;s Unopposed Motion for Admission of Bijan Esfandiari. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff;s Unopposed Motion for Admission of Bijan Esfandiari by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Feldman, #2 Affidavit Bijan Esfandiari, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole K. Maldonado. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole K. Maldonado by EMMA SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicole Mal, #2 Declaration Laura Feldman, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELDMAN, LAURA) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. DAROCI on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (DAROCI, STEVEN) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 2/17/2022 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/18/2022. (eh, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Counsel did not add herself to the docket as representing the defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, case number MON-L-004022-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13099815). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Daroci Esq. II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAREN A. CONFOY