This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2020 at 09:58:51 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Gaddick et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Sullivan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Gaddick INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William L. Sullivan

Montgomery, AL 36110

Defendants

Lynn Head

Joel Barnes

Terry Davis

Charles Gaddick

Clifford Walker

Charles Graddick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Laura Beck Mest

Attorney at AL Brd of Pardons and Paroles

301 S Ripley St - Bldg D

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker. (Mest, Laura) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beck Mest on behalf of Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker (Mest, Laura) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

#14

(#14) MOTION to Amend #2 Inmate 1983 Complaint, by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(cwl, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#13

(#13) Received partial Filing fee: $ 18.00, receipt number 4602058048 (djy, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#12

(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Clifford Walker served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#11

(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Lynn Head served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#10

(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Charles Graddick served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#9

(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Terry Davis served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Gaddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker, filed by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(hrs, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker. (Mest, Laura) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beck Mest on behalf of Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker (Mest, Laura) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Amend #2 Inmate 1983 Complaint, by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(cwl, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Received partial Filing fee: $ 18.00, receipt number 4602058048 (djy, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Clifford Walker served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Lynn Head served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Charles Graddick served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Terry Davis served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Joel Barnes served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT and ANSWER on or before 7/1/2020, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants; mailed with complaint to General Counsel for ADOC and General Counsel for the Alabama Board of Pardons & Paroles. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/20/20. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received initial partial Filing fee: $ 29.90, receipt number 4602057917. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION considering #4 Motion to Amend as a motion for status; granting #4 Motion for status to the extent addressed in this order; Plf is advised: (i) this case is pending on his complaint; (ii) Plaintiff is under order entered 4/24/2020, to file an initial filing fee of $29.90 by 5/15/2020, or the court will recommend this action be dismissed for his failure to comply with the order of the court (see Doc. #3 ); and (3) pending receipt of the initial filing fee, the court will enter any further order or Recommendation as deemed necessary and appropriate; directing the Clerk is to furnish Plf with a copy of the docket sheet for this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/18/2020. Mailed with copy of docket sheet, as directed. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to Amend plf's #2 Inmate 1983 Complaint, by William L. Sullivan. (djy, ). Added MOTION for status on 5/18/2020 pursuant to #5 order (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $29.90 be paid on or before 5/15/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full; granting #1 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order, as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Red Eagle Honor Farm. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/24/2020. Furnished to cashier. (djy, ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Gaddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker, filed by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(hrs, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by William L. Sullivan. (hrs, ) Modified on 4/22/2020 to clarify text to removed incorrect motion event docketed in error (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less