This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:18:00 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Sullivan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Arizona Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are G Murray Snow and James F Metcalf (PS). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01996

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

Referral Judge

James F Metcalf (PS)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Sullivan

Defendants

Unknown Parties

Arizona Department of Corrections

Charles L Ryan

Unknown Adams

K Rasche

Unknown Rasche

Marc Adams

David Shinn

Arizona, State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DeeAn Gillespie Strub

Attorney at Gillespie Shields Goldfarb & Taylor

7319 N 16Th St.

Phoenix, AZ 85020

Kristina Beth Reeves

Attorney at Gillespie Shields Goldfarb & Taylor

7319 N 16Th St.

Phoenix, AZ 85020

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Evan Gottfried

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

Neil Singh

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Gabriel Sullivan. Party Unknown Adams (named as: Jane Doe Adams - spouse) and Unknown Rasche (named as: Jane Doe Rasche - spouse) terminated. (Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Marc Adams, Unknown Adams, K Rasche, Unknown Rasche, The State of Arizona filed by Gabriel Sullivan.(Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file and serve his first amended complaint within 14 days from the date this Order is filed. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/2/2020. (WLP) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#7

(#7) First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Gabriel Sullivan. (Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Neil Singh. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche, Charles L Ryan, David Shinn. (EJA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE re: Pending Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche, Charles L Ryan, David Shinn . (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #4

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054772. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18777633 filed by Charles L Ryan, David Shinn, Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche. (submitted by Michael Gottfried) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Gabriel Sullivan. Party Unknown Adams (named as: Jane Doe Adams - spouse) and Unknown Rasche (named as: Jane Doe Rasche - spouse) terminated. (Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Marc Adams, Unknown Adams, K Rasche, Unknown Rasche, The State of Arizona filed by Gabriel Sullivan.(Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file and serve his first amended complaint within 14 days from the date this Order is filed. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/2/2020. (WLP) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION to Amend/Correct by Gabriel Sullivan. (Reeves, Kristina) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) filed by Marc Adams, K Rasche, David Shinn, Arizona Department of Corrections, Charles L Ryan. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Neil Singh. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche, Charles L Ryan, David Shinn. (EJA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE re: Pending Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche, Charles L Ryan, David Shinn . (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054772. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18777633 filed by Charles L Ryan, David Shinn, Arizona Department of Corrections, K Rasche. (submitted by Michael Gottfried) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina Beth Reeves