This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 19:35:59 (UTC).

SULLIVAN et al v. CHESTER WATER AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 SULLIVAN filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against CHESTER WATER AUTHORITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JON D. LEVY and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY B SULLIVAN

Portland, ME 04101

Defendants

CHESTER WATER AUTHORITY

JUDGE DOMINIC PILEGGI

EEOC PHILADELPHIA OFFICE

ROBYN S BENNETT

CROZER CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER

DR EDWARD R STANKIEWICZ

PARK CARE OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH

HOSTEN AND ASSOCIATES OF MEDIA PA

MARK ALAN RAITH

CITY OF CHESTER PENNSYLVANIA

INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF FIREMEN AND OILERS SEIU LOCAL 473

HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA

DELAWARE COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

RACHEL DICKINSON, PA-C

DHHS MAINE

PORTLAND STREET PUBLIC HEALTH CENTER

MERCY HOSPITAL

MERCY PRIMARY CARE

48 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by GREGORY B SULLIVAN. (Service of Process Deadline 8/15/2022)(bfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2022 to correct order of pages. Originally uploaded with pages out of order) (bfa). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

letter in support

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

letter in support

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Receive Electronic Copies by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (slg) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend Text in Original Complaint by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (slg) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend Text in Original Complaint by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (slg) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Receive Electronic Copies by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (slg) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANTS: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. cc: pro se litigant (bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE: Recently GREGORY B SULLIVAN filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. On the Court's website there is information and a handout for self-represented (pro se) parties titled Information for Pro Se Parties. #https://www.med.uscourts.gov/sites/med/files/PROSEINFORMATIONHANDOUT.pdf This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. (bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (Attachments: #1 letter in support)(bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by GREGORY B SULLIVAN (Attachments: #1 letter in support)(bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by GREGORY B SULLIVAN. (Service of Process Deadline 8/15/2022)(bfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2022 to correct order of pages. Originally uploaded with pages out of order) (bfa). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases where HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT CCMC LLC, DBA Crozer Chester Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Mercy Hospital Jefferson is a litigant