This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:16:12 (UTC).

Sullins v. Moreland et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Sullins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Moreland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and Emily C. Marks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Sullins

Defendants

Jeffrey Moreland

Geico Casualty Company

J & J Martin Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles James, II

Attorney at Serious Injury Law Group PC

P O Box 781

Montgomery, AL 36101

Brandon Marcellus Price-Crum

Attorney at Serious Injury Law Group PC

418 Scott St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Jeremy Dotson

Attorney at Porterfield Harper Mills Motlow & Ireland PA

22 Inverness Center Parkway Suite 600

Birmingham, AL 35242

Joshua Jonathan Jackson

Attorney at Samford & Denson, LLP

Po Box 2345

Opelika, AL 36803-2345

Kevin W. R. Bufford

Attorney at Samford & Denson LLP

709 Ave A

Opelika, AL 36801

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#20

(#20) (JOINDER) MOTION for Joinder to Opposition to Motion to Remand by Geico Casualty Company. (Jackson, Joshua) Modified on 9/9/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#19

(#19) (Response to Order to Show Cause) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, 15 Text Order filed by J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland. (Dotson, Michael) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#18

(#18) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by Charles Sullins. (Price-Crum, Brandon) Modified on 9/3/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#16

(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Sullins. (James, Charles) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clarify as satisfying #12 deficiency notice (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#14

(#14) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles Sullins. (James, Charles) Modified on 8/25/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

12 #1

Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format

#12

(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Sullins. (James, Charles) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clarify as satisfying #12 deficiency notice (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

1 #10

receipt

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C - Geico Casualty Company Consent to removal

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A - State Court Record

1 #2

State Court Amended Complaint

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(CONSENT TO REMOVAL) JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, by Geico Casualty Company. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINDER re #19 Response to Motion by Geico Casualty Company. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #20 for pdf) (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) (JOINDER) MOTION for Joinder to Opposition to Motion to Remand by Geico Casualty Company. (Jackson, Joshua) Modified on 9/9/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) (Response to Order to Show Cause) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court, 15 Text Order filed by J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland. (Dotson, Michael) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Doyle: #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand by Charles Sullins. (Price-Crum, Brandon) Modified on 9/3/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Sullins. (James, Charles) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clarify as satisfying #12 deficiency notice (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Before the undersigned is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Doc. #14 ). Defendant shall show cause, if any there be, why the Motion should not be granted. Defendant shall respond on or before 9/8/2020. Plaintiff may reply on or before 9/15/2020. The parties shall also return their consent or reassignment forms so that they are received by the Clerk on or before 9/4/2020, as previously set out in this Court's order dated 8/7/2020 (Doc. #7 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/25/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cwl, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles Sullins. (James, Charles) Modified on 8/25/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Jackson, Joshua) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by J & J Martin Inc. (Dotson, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2020 to clarify as satisfying #3 deficiency notice & to remove Jeffrey Moreland as a filer (cwl, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #4 CDS - Attorney Kevin W. R. Bufford for Geico Casualty Company added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company. (Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 7/31/2020 to clarify as satisfying #3 deficiency notice (cwl, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jeffrey Moreland, J & J Martin Inc., Geico Casualty Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Geico Casualty Company, J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland, Charles Sullins. (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(CONSENT TO REMOVAL) JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, by Geico Casualty Company. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing to State Court by J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT against Geico Casualty Company, J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland, filed by Charles Sullins. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J & J Martin Inc., Jeffrey Moreland from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-CV-20-900091. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058724) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C - Geico Casualty Company Consent to removal, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 receipt) (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Jonathan Jackson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Dodson