This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 11:14:57 (UTC).

Suh v. Lee

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Suh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and HELEN GILLMOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hae Suk Suh

Defendants

Dong Woo Lee

Keeaumoku Development, LLC

Gaya International LLC

Shawn Lee

Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC

Sirinan LLC

Connie Hee Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. Muzzi

Attorney at Tsugawa Lau & Muzzi LLLC

1132 Bishop Street, Suite 2400, 531-0490

Honolulu, HI 96813

Leila M Rothwell Sullivan

Attorney at Tsugawa Lau & Muzzi LLLC

1132 Bishop Street, Suite 2400, 531-0490

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

John S. Rhee

1001 Bishop Street 18Th Floor, 524-1800, Fax: 524-4591

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jesse J.T. Smith

Attorney at Yamamoto Caliboso LLLC

1100 Alakea St Ste 3100

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#26) EO: The Court ONVERTS the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference into a Telephonic Status Conference for the same date of 06/21/2021 but advanced from 9:30 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Dong Woo Lee aka Shawn Lee, Gaya International, LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complai filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Muzzi, #2 Declaration of Soyeon Hiremath, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hae Suk Suh re #23 Amended Complaint, (Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Gaya International LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee, filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muzzi, Christopher) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jo) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On June 2, 2021, Defendants Dong Woo Lee, Gaya International LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan LLC filed:MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (ECF No. #21 ). Plaintiff shall file her Opposition on or before Wednesday, June 16, 2021.Defendants shall file their Reply on or before Tuesday, June 22, 2021.A hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #21 ) shall be held on Monday, June 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m, before the Honorable Helen Gillmor by telephone.Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaiis current Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Pandemic and Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings pursuant to the CARES Act, this hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via the Court's AT&T teleconference services. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. PARTICIPANT INSTRUCTIONS:Step 1: Dial 1-888-684-8852.Step 2: Enter "7273604#" (Access Code followed by the pound (#) sign).Step 3: Participant will hear system say, "To join the conference as host press star (*), otherwise press pound (#)." Enter '#'.The system will then say "The host has not yet arrived. Please stand by." Participant should continue to hold until the Host arrives.(rls, ) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Dong Woo Lee aka Shawn Lee, Gaya International, LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt.1]; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Dong Woo Lee; Declaration of John Rhee John S. Rhee appearing for Defendants Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Sirinan LLC, Gaya International LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Dong Woo Lee, Connie Hee Lee (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dong Woo Lee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Declaration John Rhee, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rhee, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sirinan LLC. (Rhee, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keeaumoku Development, LLC. (Rhee, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC. (Rhee, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gaya International LLC. (Rhee, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Keeaumoku Development, LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Sirinan LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Gaya International LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/21/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00194 HG-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Hae Suk Suh Notice of Pendency Action Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dong Woo Lee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2513682.), filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Muzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Muzzi