This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:19:23 (UTC).

Sugartown Worldwide LLC v. KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Sugartown Worldwide LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sugartown Worldwide LLC

Defendants

KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc.

Brandi McDonald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theresa Davis Beaton

Attorney at Roberts Tate, LLC

2487 Demere Rd, Suite 400, P O Box 21828

Saint Simons Island, GA 31522

James A. Trigg

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1100 Peachtree St., Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4528

Defendant Attorney

James Wrixam McIlvaine

Attorney at Williams Litigation Group, P.C.

Po Box 279

Brunswick, GA 31521

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

11 #2

Exhibit Certificate Good Standing

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Trigg Receipt Number 113J-2634365, Fee Amount $200, by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. The deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference is stayed until the parties reach a final agreement or until June 27, 2019 should the parties be unable to reach a final agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/22/19. (slt) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald. (McIlvaine, James) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald.(McIlvaine, James) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Brandi McDonald on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

3 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. $400.00 Filing Fee - Receipt Number: 113J-2564359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 3/20/2019 (slt). (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sugartown Worldwide LLC identifying Oxford Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Consent MOTION for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James A. Trigg. Theresa D. Beaton has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on July 3, 2019. (edd) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Trigg (slt) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Trigg Receipt Number 113J-2634365, Fee Amount $200, by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)(Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. The deadline for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference is stayed until the parties reach a final agreement or until June 27, 2019 should the parties be unable to reach a final agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/22/19. (slt) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald. (McIlvaine, James) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc., Brandi McDonald.(McIlvaine, James) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. answer due 4/16/2019. Brandi McDonald answer due 4/16/2019. (slt) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on KK's Enterprises of Georgia, Inc. on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Brandi McDonald on 03/26/2019, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2564359. (csr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (csr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sugartown Worldwide LLC. $400.00 Filing Fee - Receipt Number: 113J-2564359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) Modified on 3/20/2019 (slt). (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sugartown Worldwide LLC identifying Oxford Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/20/2019. (csr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.