This case was last updated from PACER on 01/22/2021 at 08:16:07 (UTC).

Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc v. Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Church Mutual Insurance Company S I. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01182

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc

Defendant

Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Engel

Attorney at Mansell Engel & Cole PC

204 N Robinson, 21St Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7201

Jordyn L Cartmell

Attorney at Mansell Engel & Cole

204 N. Robinson Avenue, Ste 21St Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorney

Kenyatta R Bethea

Attorney at Holloway Bethea & Osenbaugh PLLC

3035 Nw 63Rd, Suite 102 N

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 09:15 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (md) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. . (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jordyn L Cartmell on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Adam Engel on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Engel, Adam) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of All Defendants (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet from State Court

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Cole

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons to Church Mutual

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Engel

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5158 filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Engel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Church Mutual, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Cole, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet from State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 09:15 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (md) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. . (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jordyn L Cartmell on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Adam Engel on behalf of Sugarloaf Christian Fellowship Inc (Engel, Adam) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of All Defendants (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3397558. (Bethea, Kenyatta) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5158 filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Engel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Church Mutual, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance - Atty Cole, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet from State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant