This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 08:06:15 (UTC).

Suda et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Suda filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Customs and Border Protection. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ana Suda

Martha Hernandez

Defendants

Kevin K. McAleenan

John Does 1-25

United States Customs and Border Protection

Paul O'Neal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Ann Rand Coffman

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK

Po Box 759, 1667 Whitefish Stage Road

Kalispell, MT 59901

Alexander H. Rate

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MONTANA

Po Box 9138

Missoula, MT 59807

Elizabeth K. Ehret

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MONTANA

Po Box 9138

Missoula, MT 59807

Cody H. Wofsy

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Omar C. Jadwat

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT - NEW YORK

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Jadwat, Omar) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Wofsy, Cody) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Return of Service

#14

(#14) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit Return of Service

#13

(#13) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

12 #2

Exhibit Return of service

#12

(#12) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 3/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Return of service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#8

(#15) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Wofsy, Cody) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order PHV PO

5 #1

Declaration

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Declaration

#4

(#8) ORDER granting #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Omar C. Jadwat and Cody H. Wofsy for plaintiffs Martha Hernandez and Ana Suda; Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/4/2019. (TLO) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Elizabeth K. Ehret re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Ehret. (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan, Paul O'Neal, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Originals mailed to Alex Rate) (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Ana Suda, Martha Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Jadwat, Omar) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Wofsy, Cody) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Paul O'Neal answer due 5/6/2019. (SLR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 4/22/2019. (SLR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Set Deadlines: United States Customs and Border Protection answer due 4/22/2019. (SLR) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 3/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Return of service) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • (#11) Remark: Attorney Omar Jadwat is now a registered user. (MMS) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Remark: Cody Wofsy is now a registered electronic CM/ECF user. (SLR) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Omar C. Jadwat and Cody H. Wofsy for plaintiffs Martha Hernandez and Ana Suda; Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/4/2019. (TLO) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Remark: Elizabeth Ehret is now a registered CM/ECF user. (SLR) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #4 MOTION Omar C. Jadwat to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265228.) by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 MOTION Cody Wofsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265233.) by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Cody Wofsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265233.) Alexander H. Rate appearing for Plaintiffs Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV PO) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION Omar C. Jadwat to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265228.) Alexander H. Rate appearing for Plaintiffs Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rate, Alexander) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Elizabeth K. Ehret re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Ehret. (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan, Paul O'Neal, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Originals mailed to Alex Rate) (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2264527 (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Ana Suda, Martha Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.