This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2020 at 11:42:29 (UTC).

SUCHY v. ARSTRAT, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 SUCHY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ARSTRAT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00488

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHERINE SUCHY

Defendant

ARSTRAT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARL S. GWALTNEY

Attorney at MAGINNIS LAW, PLLC

4801 Glenwood Ave., Ste. 310

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorney

CAREN D. ENLOE

Attorney at SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP

4601 Six Forks Rd., Ste. 400

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Apria Healthcare Letter

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - ARstrat, LLC Debt Collection Letter

#3

#4

4 #1

Consent Form

#5

#6

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARSTRAT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chasware Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent GetixHealth Holding Corporation for ARSTRAT, LLC.. (ENLOE, CAREN) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by ARSTRAT, LLC. (ENLOE, CAREN) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ARSTRAT, LLC. Answer due by 8/1/2020. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on July 1, 2020 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by ARSTRAT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ENLOE, CAREN) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant ARSTRAT, LLC (ENLOE, CAREN) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ARSTRAT, LLC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against ARSTRAT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2816332.), filed by CATHERINE SUCHY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Apria Healthcare Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - ARstrat, LLC Debt Collection Letter)(GWALTNEY, KARL) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARL S. GWALTNEY on behalf of Plaintiff CATHERINE SUCHY (GWALTNEY, KARL) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARSTRAT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caren D Enloe