This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2023 at 01:17:14 (UTC).

Subhan et al v. Auerbacer et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Subhan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Auerbacer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rachel P. Kovner and Anne Y. Shields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05541

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Kay

James Hicks

Ashley Cleator

Moin Mahbub

Rakin Subhan

Defendants

Ram Caterers of Old Westbury LLC

Simon Auerbacer

Ram Destinations Miami LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus Monteiro

Defendant Attorneys

Ilan Weiser

Amanda M. Fugazy

 

Court Documents

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13680645 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Rakin Subhan, Ashley Cleator, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, James Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

3 #1

Additional Corrections

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ashley Cleator, James Hicks, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, Rakin Subhan (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rakin Subhan, Ashley Cleator, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, James Hicks. All Defendants. (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rakin Subhan, Ashley Cleator, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, James Hicks. (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rakin Subhan, Ashley Cleator, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, James Hicks. All Defendants. (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Fugazy on behalf of Simon Auerbacer, Ram Caterers of Old Westbury LLC, Ram Destinations Miami LLC (aty to be noticed) (Fugazy, Amanda) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ilan Weiser on behalf of Simon Auerbacer, Ram Caterers of Old Westbury LLC, Ram Destinations Miami LLC (aty to be noticed) (Weiser, Ilan) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Ashley Cleator, James Hicks, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, Rakin Subhan (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13680645 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Rakin Subhan, Ashley Cleator, David Kay, Moin Mahbub, James Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Monteiro, Marcus) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less