This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2021 at 07:22:31 (UTC).

Subert v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Subert filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00446

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi K. DuBose

Judges

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Igor Subert

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

Jason Larey

Attorney at Downs Law Group

3250 Mary St., Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #3

Authorization

8 #2

HIPAA Order

8 #1

Protective Order

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

*Restricted*

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/5/2021.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8876853) filed by Igor Subert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Igor Subert(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant