This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:08:30 (UTC).

Suber v. Mcree, et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Suber filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Mcree. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard M Gergel and Paige J Gossett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-03857

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

Referral Judge

Paige J Gossett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Suber

Defendants

John B. Mcree

Stacy L. Smith

Jacques R. Days

South Carolina Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph A Mooneyham

Attorney at Mooneyham Berry LLC

Po Box 8359, 1225 S Church Street

Greenville, SC 29604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10204048.) filed by James Suber. Service due by 2/28/2022(dist) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct filed date. (dist) Modified on 11/30/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Suber. (dist) Modified on 11/30/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jacques R. Days. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Stacy L. Smith. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to John B. Mcree. (dist) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) Modified on 12/1/2021 to correct docket text. (dist). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to South Carolina Department of Corrections. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to South Carolina Department of Corrections. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to John B. Mcree. (dist) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) Modified on 12/1/2021 to correct docket text. (dist). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Stacy L. Smith. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jacques R. Days. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Suber. (dist) Modified on 11/30/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10204048.) filed by James Suber. Service due by 2/28/2022(dist) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct filed date. (dist) Modified on 11/30/2021 to correct docket text. (dist) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Carolina Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A Mooneyham