This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:18:23 (UTC).

Suarez v. Charles et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Suarez filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Charles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12476

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayobanex Suarez

Respondents

Attorney General William P. Barr

Superintendent Steven J Souza

Sheriff Thomas M Hodgson

Acting Director Marcos Charles

Deputy Director Todd Lyons

Strafford County Sheriff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Wishnie

Attorney at Yale Law School

127 Wall Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Respondent Attorneys

Rayford A. Farquhar

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Eve A. Piemonte

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Respondents in this action shall be (1) Marcos Charles, Acting Director, Boston Field Office of ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations; and (2) the Strafford County Sheriff. All other individuals named in the Petition as Respondents shall be dismissed as parties to this action. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Acting Director Charles, the Strafford County Sheriff, and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondents shall, no later than Friday, January 3, 2020, file a motion for the grant or denial of the Petition and a memorandum in support thereof. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved to any District other than the Districts of Massachusetts or New Hampshire without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. The Motion for Order to Show Cause #2 shall be terminated as moot. Upon review of Respondents' return, the Court will determine whether a hearing is merited.(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

10 #1

Declaration

#4

(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Marcos Charles re #5 Standing Order on 2241 petitions - Alien Detainee Regarding Petitioner's Transfer (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Piemonte, Eve) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Marcos Charles re #6 Service Order - 2241 Petition,,,, #5 Standing Order on 2241 petitions - Alien Detainee of Removal (Piemonte, Eve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Marcos Charles (Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Marcos Charles (Piemonte, Eve) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mayobanex Suarez (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mayobanex Suarez (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#12) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On or before January 10, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status report. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Marcos Charles re #6 Service Order - 2241 Petition,,,, #5 Standing Order on 2241 petitions - Alien Detainee of Removal (Piemonte, Eve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #1 Exhibit) (Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Marcos Charles re #5 Standing Order on 2241 petitions - Alien Detainee Regarding Petitioner's Transfer (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Piemonte, Eve) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Marcos Charles (Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Marcos Charles (Piemonte, Eve) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause per Service Order #6 . (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Respondents in this action shall be (1) Marcos Charles, Acting Director, Boston Field Office of ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations; and (2) the Strafford County Sheriff. All other individuals named in the Petition as Respondents shall be dismissed as parties to this action. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon Acting Director Charles, the Strafford County Sheriff, and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondents shall, no later than Friday, January 3, 2020, file a motion for the grant or denial of the Petition and a memorandum in support thereof. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved to any District other than the Districts of Massachusetts or New Hampshire without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. The Motion for Order to Show Cause #2 shall be terminated as moot. Upon review of Respondents' return, the Court will determine whether a hearing is merited.(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $5.00 paid on 12/06/2019, receipt number 0101-8002951. (Tran, Henry) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (adminn, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Mayobanex Suarez.(Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8002995 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Mayobanex Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less