This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

Suarez-Jimenez v. USA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Suarez-Jimenez filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana Saldana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diana Saldana

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jaime Suarez-Jimenez

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Appellate Division

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1000 Louisiana, Ste 2300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM & ORDER. Denying #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:18-CR-185, 5:18-CR-314 (Defendant No. 01).For the foregoing reasons, Petitioners motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Dkt. 1; Cr. Dkt. 43) is hereby DENIED. Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-77 is hereby DISMISSED with PREJUDICE.(Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:18-CR-185, 5:18-CR-314 (Defendant No. 01) by Jaime Suarez-Jimenez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2019. (ehernandez, 5) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM & ORDER. Denying #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:18-CR-185, 5:18-CR-314 (Defendant No. 01).For the foregoing reasons, Petitioners motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Dkt. 1; Cr. Dkt. 43) is hereby DENIED. Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-77 is hereby DISMISSED with PREJUDICE.(Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:18-CR-185, 5:18-CR-314 (Defendant No. 01) by Jaime Suarez-Jimenez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/27/2019. (ehernandez, 5) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less