This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:16:28 (UTC).

Sturza et al v. Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Sturza filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00862

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodica Sturza

Gheorghe Sturza

Defendants

Claudiu Ratiu

Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louise N. Smith

William Julian Smith, III

Defendant Attorney

James E. Rollins, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court grants Defendants an extension to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint in this action through and including June 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/22/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc., Claudiu Ratiu. (Rollins, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gheorghe Sturza. Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Smith, Louise) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gheorghe Sturza. Claudiu Ratiu waiver mailed on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Smith, Louise) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21.(jkb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Angels Garden Senior Community, Inc., Claudiu Ratiu. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jkb) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit text. (jkb). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rodica Sturza, Gheorghe Sturza. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10779265) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less