This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2019 at 07:29:38 (UTC).

STURMAN v. THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 STURMAN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-16486

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY STURMAN

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10

HOMERO MONROY

THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TONI L. TELLES

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric A. Shore, P.C.

4 Echelon Plaza, 201 Laurel Road, 8Th Floor

Voorhees, NJ 08043

Defendant Attorneys

LAUREN JANE GLOZZY

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

77 Water Street, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10005

CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON

Attorney at BUCHANAN, INGERSOLL & ROONEY, PC

550 Broad Street, Suite 810

Newark, NJ 07102-4599

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/22/2019. (gxh) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter from Toni L. Telles, Esquire. (TELLES, TONI) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/14/19. (if, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to The Nielsen Company US LLC and Homero Monroy.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by HOMERO MONROY, THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

1 #1

Declaration of Counsel in Support of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC, HOMERO MONROY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY case number OCN-L1731-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9879623), filed by THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC, HOMERO MONROY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Removal)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jdb). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/22/2019. (gxh) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Toni L. Telles, Esquire. (TELLES, TONI) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/14/19. (if, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC, HOMERO MONROY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/29/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to The Nielsen Company US LLC and Homero Monroy.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by HOMERO MONROY, THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC, HOMERO MONROY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY case number OCN-L1731-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9879623), filed by THE NIELSEN COMPANY US LLC, HOMERO MONROY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Removal)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jdb). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NIELSEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON