This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:54:57 (UTC).

Studio Peyo S.A. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Studio Peyo S A filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06644

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Studio Peyo S.A.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Yiwu Yongsu E-Commerce Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Yc Inflatable Products Co., Ltd.

Quyang Jiazhong Garden Sculpture Co., Ltd.

Dongguan Siyuan Toy Co., Limited

100% cotton T-shirt 89 Store

Laugh party Store

shop T-shirt YM18 Store

MQL Featured Store

Disn-C Store

zhuangmy Store

Mengqi genuine Store

Optimistic girl Store

Andersen's Children's World Store

LiuLian CC Store

Trendy Goods 01 Store

FY World Store

ZYXWVU Store

Winsomecrafts

56 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #39 is entered and continued to 2/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 2/14/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

41 #1

Exhibit 1

#41

(#41) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

40 #1

Exhibit 1

#40

(#40) MEMORANDUM by Studio Peyo S.A. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

39 #1

Exhibit A

#39

(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Studio Peyo S.A. as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#37

(#37) Preliminary Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/19/2022.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/21/2022 (nsf, ). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #39 is entered and continued to 2/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 2/14/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM by Studio Peyo S.A. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Studio Peyo S.A. as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Yiwu Yongsu E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Yc Inflatable Products Co., Ltd., Quyang Jiazhong Garden Sculpture Co., Ltd., Dongguan Siyuan Toy Co., Limited, 100% cotton T-shirt 89 Store, Laugh party Store, shop T-shirt YM18 Store, MQL Featured Store, Disn-C Store, zhuangmy Store, Mengqi genuine Store, Optimistic girl Store, Andersen's Children's World Store, LiuLian CC Store, Trendy Goods 01 Store, FY World Store, ZYXWVU Store, Winsomecrafts, Huang Hongshuo7520, rfehsre, LVBEN, jinhainashipin, JUUYU, yukunshop, US-Jayyed, HNKDSH, chengxiangouxialinhuanhaidanfuzhuangdian, reedpipe, xianyoujunxing, A1MJUZXJWLJZJ7, hjkgihkdfgh, ZHONGJI SHOP, yuchendianshang, wanzundianshang, Minimalist impression decorative painting, chengxinyou, YCDS, Aassys, YongAnShiHuaShengDianDongGongJuWeiXiuDian, Reagoo, chensanAMZ, yujiashop, shiwenmaoyi, A2NZDGMWH083OJ, HeBeiSenTengLiuTiDongLiYouXianGongSi, A2YYY9Q8WZXE5, XinShaoXianLiangYunBaiHuoDian, dixinyu1, YQCHSC, xuexiaojuandedian, Arrive within 7-14 days, chunchun-store, LSWSXHZ, chenshengxiaoshangdian, yaofubaihuo, jiesang shop, Da Bleu Oil Painting, GAOJIDA, liucongyongriben, ZhaiLili Art, yamengjiajushipin, HHTTJCFLL, Hai Kou Shi Shou Guo Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si, henantaixianmaoyiyouxiangongsi, YaoRuFen, Linosen, Nivisa Store, Livex516, dhgying16, Zuohaian002, nonope Store, jason2021-62, jiejie8650 and victorxing1978 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Preliminary Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/19/2022.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/11/2022 at 9:15 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk shall unseal any documents that are sealed. The Law Firm of Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd., is ordered to add ALL defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 3/11/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 1/18/2022 at 9:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 1/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing set for 1/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in regards to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 . Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 1/18/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Studio Peyo S.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Studio Peyo S.A. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/21/2022 (nsf, ). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Studio Peyo S.A.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18963120. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 100% cotton T-shirt 151 Store is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaku Begert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson