This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:50:40 (UTC).

Stubbs v. Parcel 1 et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Stubbs filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Parcel 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks, Wallace Capel, Jr, Jerusha T. Adams and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00519

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Emily C. Marks

William Keith Watkins

Referral Judges

Wallace Capel, Jr

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara Jean Stubbs

Barbara Stubbs Gill

Defendants

Georgia Power Company

Parcel 1

SPMCA Corp.

Kaufman & Forman, P.C.

ELM Leasing, LLC

Sandra L. Gibbs

Montgomery, AL 36117

Tammy Thomas

Montgomery, AL 36105

Joseph McKinnes

Union Springs, AL 36089

BillPay Processing of GA, LLC

John Gill

Ten Talents Ministry

Zachary Thomas

Montgomery, AL 36105

Eastern Property Development, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zebulon H. Vaughn

P O Drawer 3738

Auburn, AL 36860

Christine Rolniak Patton

Attorney at Akridge & Balch PC

852 N. Dean Road; Suite 100

Auburn, AL 36830

Defendant Attorneys

Whitney J Della Torre

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

801 Broad St - Ste 800

Augusta, GA 30901

Brooke W. Gram

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

30 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd., Nw; Suite 700

Atlanta, GA 30308-3036

Joseph Dennis Leavens

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

P.O. Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201

Benjamin Howard Parr

Attorney at Benjamin H. Parr, P.C.

830 Avenue A Suite A

Opelika, AL 36801

Joshua Jonathan Jackson

Attorney at Samford & Denson, LLP

Po Box 2345

Opelika, AL 36803-2345

Nathan Riley Murphy

Attorney at Samford & Denson LLP

P O Box 2345

Opelika, AL 36803-2345

Kevin W. R. Bufford

Attorney at Samford & Denson LLP

709 Ave A

Opelika, AL 36801

John J.E. Markham, II

Attorney at Markham & Read

One Commercial Wharf W

Boston, MA 21100

Bridget Zerner

Attorney at Markham & Read

One Commercial Wharf W

Boston, MA 21100

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) MOTION for Brooke W. Gram to Withdraw as Attorney by Georgia Power Company. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

38 #2

Exhibit B

38 #1

Exhibit A

#38

(#38) REPLY to Plaintiff's #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Doc. #10 , #21 ) in compliance with this court's Briefing Order (Doc. #12 , filed by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clean up text, reflect actual title and create link. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

27 #2

Exhibit B

27 #1

Exhibit A

#27

(#38) REPLY to Plaintiff's #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Doc. #10 , #21 ) in compliance with this court's Briefing Order (Doc. #12 , filed by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clean up text, reflect actual title and create link. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Order

#10

(#38) REPLY to Plaintiff's #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Doc. #10 , #21 ) in compliance with this court's Briefing Order (Doc. #12 , filed by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clean up text, reflect actual title and create link. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #9

State Court Complaint

1 #8

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6, Notices of Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit 4, Lee County AL Parcel Details

1 #3

Exhibit 3, Default Judgment of Divorce

1 #2

Exhibit 2, State Court Record

1 #1

Exhibit 1, Complaint to Quiet Title

#1

NOTICE OF CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by BillPay Processing of GA, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 , Exhibit 6 for pdf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket*** Attorney Brooke W. Gram terminated pursuant to 40 Text Order. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Brooke W. Gram to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/16/2020. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Brooke W. Gram to Withdraw as Attorney by Georgia Power Company. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) REPLY to Plaintiff's #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Doc. #10 , #21 ) in compliance with this court's Briefing Order (Doc. #12 , filed by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 9/8/2020 to clean up text, reflect actual title and create link. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPLY to Defendants' Responses (Doc. #32 , #33 ) to #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Barbara Jean Stubbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Vaughn, Zebulon) Modified on 9/8/2020 to reflect actual title and create links. (dmn, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RESPONSE to Plaintiff's #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court, and #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by ELM Leasing, LLC, SPMCA Corp. (Parr, Benjamin) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clean up text. (dmn, ) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by ELM Leasing, LLC. (Parr, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by SPMCA Corp.. (Parr, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kaufman & Forman, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bufford, Kevin) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Georgia Power Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (STRICKEN; ENTERED IN ERROR) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Kaufman & Forman, P.C.; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) Modified on 7/31/2020 (amf, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (amf, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION (STIPULATION) for Extension of Time to File Answer by Georgia Power Company, Barbara Jean Stubbs. (Leavens, Joseph) Modified on 7/31/2020 to add as also filed on behalf of the Plaintiff (amf, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by BillPay Processing of GA, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 , Exhibit 6 for pdf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Eastern Property Development, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 , Exhibit 6 for pdf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONSENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Georgia Power Company. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 , Exhibit 6 for pdf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT for Quiet Title against BillPay Processing of GA, LLC, ELM Leasing, LLC, Eastern Property Development, LLC, Georgia Power Company, Sandra L. Gibbs, John Gill, Kaufman & Forman, P.C., Joseph McKinnes, Parcel 1, SPMCA Corp., Ten Talents Ministry, Tammy Thomas, Zachary Thomas, filed by Barbara Jean Stubbs.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 , Exhibit 1 for pdf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaufman & Forman, P.C. from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number CV-2020-900290. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058706) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint to Quiet Title, #2 Exhibit 2, State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3, Default Judgment of Divorce, #4 Exhibit 4, Lee County AL Parcel Details, #5 Exhibit 5, USDC/MDGA Order Granting Permanent Injunction, #6 Exhibit 6, Notices of Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt, #9 State Court Complaint) (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGIA POWER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph D Leavens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Jonathan Jackson